DIRECTORS’
PROFILES
Dato’ Abdel Aziz @ Abdul Aziz Bin Abu Bakar (Male), aged 64,
was appointed a Non-Executive Director of AirAsia Group
Berhad (AAGB) on 30 March 2018. He is the Chairman of the
Risk Management Committee and a member of the Audit and
Nomination and Remuneration Committees of the Board of AAGB.
He was appointed a Non-Executive Director of AirAsia Berhad on
20 April 2005. On 16 June 2008, he was re-designated as Non-
Executive Chairman and, subsequently, as a Non-Independent
Non-Executive Director in November 2013. He is also a member
of the Audit Committee and Nomination and Remuneration
Committee. Prior to this, he served as a Director of the Company
from 12 December 2001 to 11 October 2004; and then as an
Alternate Director to Dato’ Pahamin Ab. Rajab from 11 October
2004.
Dato’ Aziz is currently the Executive Chairman of VDSL
Technology Sdn Bhd. He served as Chairman of Performance and
Artistes Rights Malaysia Sdn Bhd (PRISM), a collection society
for performers of recorded music, and the Academy of Malaysian
Music Industry Association (PAIMM) for more than 10 years until
end 2012 and January 2011, respectively.
From 1981 to 1983, he was the Executive Director of Showmasters
(M) Sdn Bhd, an artiste management and concert promotion
company. He subsequently joined BMG Music and was General
Manager from 1989 to 1997, and Managing Director from 1997
to 1999. He received a Diploma in Agriculture from Universiti
Pertanian Malaysia in 1975, a BSc in Agriculture Business from
Louisiana State University, USA in 1978, and an MBA from the
University of Dallas, USA in 1980.
He is also currently a Director of Yayasan Astro Kasih and a
Non-Executive Non-Independent Chairman of Pegasus Heights
Berhad (formerly known as Naim Indah Corporation Berhad) and
a member of its Audit, Nomination and Remuneration Committees.
DATO’ ABDEL AZIZ
@ ABDUL AZIZ BIN
ABU BAKAR
Non-Independent Non-Executive Director
Malaysian
[ ]
AirAsia Group Berhad
LEADERSHIP
40